NY A06498 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s4738
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - substituted by s4738
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Brookhaven to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from Iglesia Evangelica Apostol for certain parcels of land located in the town of Brookhaven.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Brookhaven to accept an application for exemption from real property taxes from Iglesia Evangelica Apostol for certain parcels of land located in the town of Brookhaven.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s4738 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.439 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S04738 (Same As) 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.132