NY A06527 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-20 - signed chap.442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the Schenectady county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Schenectady.
Title
Relates to authorizing the Schenectady county correctional facility to also be used for the detention of persons under arrest being held for arraignment in any court located in the county of Schenectady.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-20 | Senate | signed chap.442 |
2015-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4518 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.213 |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S04518 (Same As) 2015-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6527