NY A06538 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - substituted by s6293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - substituted by s6293
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a child care leave credit for New York city uniformed correction officers who are members of the New York city uniformed correction/sanitation revised plan.
Title
Relates to a child care leave credit for New York city uniformed correction officers who are members of the New York city uniformed correction/sanitation revised plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s6293 |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.868 |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06293 (Same As) 2023-12-08 - SIGNED CHAP.710