NY A06545 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-15 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-15 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that parents and caretakers who are otherwise eligible for a child care subsidy shall receive a subsidy when care is necessary to enable them to sleep because they work a late shift and have a child who is under the age of six and not in school for a full school day; further provides that the authorization for a subsidy shall be sufficient to allow the parent to obtain eight hours of sleep.
Title
Provides that parents and caretakers who are otherwise eligible for a child care subsidy shall receive a subsidy when care is necessary to enable them to sleep because they work a late shift and have a child who is under the age of six and not in school for a full school day; further provides that the authorization for a subsidy shall be sufficient to allow the parent to obtain eight hours of sleep.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2011-03-21 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S04115 (Same As) 2012-04-30 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE