NY A06655 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-14)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - print number 6655d
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires registration of new automotive broker businesses; enacts various provisions relating to conduct of such businesses; defines certain deceptive practices; establishes rights of action and penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires registration of new automotive broker businesses; enacts various provisions relating to conduct of such businesses; defines certain deceptive practices; establishes rights of action and penalties.

Sponsors

Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Karines Reyes [D]
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]
Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]
Asm. Sandra Galef [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Joseph DeStefano [R]
Asm. John Mikulin [R]Asm. Doug Smith [R]Asm. Nader Sayegh [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]
Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Dan Quart [D]
Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]Asm. Michael LiPetri [R]Asm. Michael Reilly [R]Asm. Brian Miller [R]
Asm. Nily Rozic [D]Asm. Anthony Palumbo [R]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]
Asm. Sean Ryan [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]Asm. Catalina Cruz [D]Asm. Stacey Pheffer Amato [D]
Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]Asm. Edward Ra [R]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]
Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]Asm. Judy Griffin [D]Asm. D. Billy Jones [D]
Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D]Asm. Michael Blake [D]Asm. Amy Paulin [D]Asm. Edward Braunstein [D]
Asm. Charles Fall [D]Asm. Mathylde Frontus [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Monica Wallace [D]
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]Asm. Peter Lawrence [R]
Asm. Jo Simon [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15Assemblyprint number 6655d
2019-06-15Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-06-14Assemblyprint number 6655c
2019-06-14Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-06-11Assemblyprint number 6655b
2019-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-05-24Assemblyprint number 6655a
2019-05-24Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2019-03-14Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S04364 (Same As) 2019-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 4364C

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06655&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06655&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06655
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06655&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06655A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06655&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06655B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06655&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06655C
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06655&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06655D

Bill Comments

feedback