NY A06683 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5864a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides a television writers' and directors' fees and salaries credit; provides that to be eligible the writer or director is a minority group member, or a woman, and provides, further, that any writer or director who is a profit participant in the qualified production shall not be eligible.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides a television writers' and directors' fees and salaries credit; provides that to be eligible the writer or director is a minority group member, or a woman, and provides, further, that any writer or director who is a profit participant in the qualified production shall not be eligible.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted by s5864a
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.594
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.594
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-11Assemblyprint number 6683b
2019-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-05-23Assemblyprint number 6683a
2019-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-03-15Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S05864 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - returned to senate

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06683&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06683&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06683
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06683&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06683A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06683&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06683B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06683&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06683&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2

Bill Comments

feedback