NY A06742 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - substituted by s5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - substituted by s5200
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the Town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk.
Title
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the Town of Brookhaven, county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] | Sen. Dean Murray [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | substituted by s5200 |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.541 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05200 (Same As) 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.246