NY A06754 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.210
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.210
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authority for an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax for the county of Monroe through November 30, 2015.
Title
Extends the authority for an additional one percent sales and compensating use tax for the county of Monroe through November 30, 2015.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 102 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.210 |
2013-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.886 |
2013-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4702 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | home rule request |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.237 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.237 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | print number 6754a |
2013-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04702 (Same As) 2013-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6754A