NY A06761 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.361
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the New York state department of transportation to conduct a study to evaluate the configuration and signage of entrance and exit ramps on the Southern State Parkway in Nassau and Suffolk counties to determine whether adequate safety measures exist to prevent collisions and the instance of wrong way drivers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the New York state department of transportation to conduct a study to evaluate the configuration and signage of entrance and exit ramps on the Southern State Parkway in Nassau and Suffolk counties to determine whether adequate safety measures exist to prevent collisions and the instance of wrong way drivers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.361
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-06SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-06Senate3RD READING CAL.1543
2018-06-06SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3137A
2018-06-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-04Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.993
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-05-09Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2018-04-24Assemblyprint number 6761a
2018-04-24Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to transportation
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to transportation
2017-03-17Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S03137 (Same As) 2018-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6761A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06761&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06761&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06761
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06761&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A06761A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06761&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06761&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A06761&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A6761#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback