NY A06771 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.519
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Plandome Manor to enter into contracts to sell delinquent tax liens; extends effectiveness of provisions.
Title
Authorizes the village of Plandome Manor to enter into contracts to sell delinquent tax liens; extends effectiveness of provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-20 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.519 |
2019-11-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.155 |
2019-06-17 | Senate | substituted for a6771 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.795 |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s4769 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.155 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.155 |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S04769 (Same As) 2019-11-20 - SIGNED CHAP.519