NY A06799 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - print number 6799b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - print number 6799b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a drug-induced movement disorder screening education program; provides that the department shall develop such program to educate the public about the importance of screening for drug-induced movement disorders, develop and disseminate educational materials for healthcare providers regarding treatment for drug-induced movement disorders, and eliminate bias and reduction of stigma for people living with drug-induced movement disorders related to the treatment of mental health conditions.
Title
Establishes a drug-induced movement disorder screening education program; provides that the department shall develop such program to educate the public about the importance of screening for drug-induced movement disorders, develop and disseminate educational materials for healthcare providers regarding treatment for drug-induced movement disorders, and eliminate bias and reduction of stigma for people living with drug-induced movement disorders related to the treatment of mental health conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Assembly | print number 6799b |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-12-08 | Assembly | print number 6799a |
2023-12-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08965 (Same As) 2024-04-19 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING