NY S08965 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a drug-induced movement disorder screening education program; provides that the department shall develop such program to educate the public about the importance of screening for drug-induced movement disorders, develop and disseminate educational materials for healthcare providers regarding treatment for drug-induced movement disorders, and eliminate bias and reduction of stigma for people living with drug-induced movement disorders related to the treatment of mental health conditions.
Title
Establishes a drug-induced movement disorder screening education program; provides that the department shall develop such program to educate the public about the importance of screening for drug-induced movement disorders, develop and disseminate educational materials for healthcare providers regarding treatment for drug-induced movement disorders, and eliminate bias and reduction of stigma for people living with drug-induced movement disorders related to the treatment of mental health conditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.838 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8965A |
2024-04-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2024-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06799 (Same As) 2024-04-12 - print number 6799b