NY A06801 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s4741b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - substituted by s4741b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to private school agents' certificates.
Title
Relates to private school agents' certificates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted by s4741b |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.130 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.130 |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 6801b |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | print number 6801a |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | reference changed to higher education |
2015-04-02 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04741 (Same As) 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.475