NY S04741 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.475
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - SIGNED CHAP.475
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to private school agents' certificates.
Title
Relates to private school agents' certificates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.475 |
2016-11-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.130 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a6801b |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1726 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4741B |
2016-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-05-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4741A |
2016-05-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2015-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A06801 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s4741b