NY A06812 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - reference changed to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-17 - reference changed to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the residency requirement for certain county attorney positions within Essex county including assistant public defender.
Title
Waives the residency requirement for certain county attorney positions within Essex county including assistant public defender.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-17 | Assembly | reference changed to local governments |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | committed to ways and means |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.193 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.724 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.724 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | print number 6812b |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | print number 6812a |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05608 (Same As) 2024-03-27 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING