NY A06837 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.477
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adjournments in contemplation of dismissal and suspended judgments in child protective proceedings in the family court.
Title
Relates to adjournments in contemplation of dismissal and suspended judgments in child protective proceedings in the family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.477 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.450 |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04767 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES