NY A06960 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of electric assisted bicycles unless the packaging contains a notice stating that the operation of such electric assisted bicycle on any public highway, road or sidewalk is unlawful.
Title
Prohibits the sale of electric assisted bicycles unless the packaging contains a notice stating that the operation of such electric assisted bicycle on any public highway, road or sidewalk is unlawful.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.242 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.242 |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | print number 6960b |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | print number 6960a |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2017-03-28 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S05482 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION