NY A06963 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-10 - approval memo.17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on January 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-10 - approval memo.17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the regulation of the profession and practice of applied behavior analysis.
Title
Provides for the regulation of the profession and practice of applied behavior analysis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-10 | Senate | approval memo.17 |
2014-01-10 | Senate | signed chap.554 |
2013-12-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.799 |
2013-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4862B |
2013-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.196 |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.196 |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 6963b |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | print number 6963a |
2013-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2013-04-26 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S04862 (Same As) 2013-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A6963B