NY A06979 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum award available under the historic preservation tax credit from five million dollars to twelve million dollars over a period of three years.
Title
Increases the maximum award available under the historic preservation tax credit from five million dollars to twelve million dollars over a period of three years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-12-04 | Assembly | print number 6979a |
2013-12-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2013-04-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S04642 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - referred to ways and means