NY A07041 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Saddle Rock Minyan to file an application for retroactive real property tax exemption with respect to the 2021-2022 and 2022-2023 assessment rolls.
Title
Authorizes Saddle Rock Minyan to file an application for retroactive real property tax exemption with respect to the 2021-2022 and 2022-2023 assessment rolls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.197 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.539 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.539 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7041a |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06797 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT