NY A07097 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes standards for the prompt investigation and settlement of claims arising out of states of emergency and disasters.
Title
Establishes standards for the prompt investigation and settlement of claims arising out of states of emergency and disasters.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.255 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.539 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-04-05 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03553 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE