NY A07099 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-10 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing family support centers for youth at risk of being, or alleged or adjudicated to be juvenile delinquents or persons in need of supervision; authorizes reimbursement to counties.
Title
Relates to establishing family support centers for youth at risk of being, or alleged or adjudicated to be juvenile delinquents or persons in need of supervision; authorizes reimbursement to counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S05475 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE