NY A07135 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5704
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5704
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing performance of duty disability retirement benefits for ambulance medical technician supervisors, ambulance medical technician coordinators and ambulance medical technicians in Nassau county.
Title
Relates to providing performance of duty disability retirement benefits for ambulance medical technician supervisors, ambulance medical technician coordinators and ambulance medical technicians in Nassau county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5704 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.543 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-04-10 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05704 (Same As) 2017-11-29 - VETOED MEMO.198