NY A07248 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.222
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to suspension or demotion upon the abolition or reduction of positions for labor class and noncompetitive titles.
Title
Relates to suspension or demotion upon the abolition or reduction of positions for labor class and noncompetitive titles.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Asm. Taylor Darling [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service And Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.222 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-11 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-11 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.311 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | substituted for a7248 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.752 |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s5291 |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.311 |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05291 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.222