NY A07250 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits special assessments on hazardous wastes generated at a brownfield site administered voluntarily by a city, town, village or county.
Title
Prohibits special assessments on hazardous wastes generated at a brownfield site administered voluntarily by a city, town, village or county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7250b |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.347 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.449 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.449 |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | print number 7250a |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S04998 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - referred to environmental conservation