NY A07260 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s4752
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s4752
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a certain portion of state route 20A the "Livingston County Veterans Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a certain portion of state route 20A the "Livingston County Veterans Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Nojay [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s4752 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.699 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.699 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-08 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04752 (Same As) 2013-11-08 - SIGNED CHAP.464