NY A07276 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - print number 7276b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-08 - print number 7276b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates as peace officers, members of the security force of Alfred University.
Title
Designates as peace officers, members of the security force of Alfred University.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7276b |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | print number 7276a |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-05-01 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S03671 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - referred to codes