NY A07373 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - substituted by s5773
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requirements for the NYS science, technology, engineering and mathematics incentive program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requirements for the NYS science, technology, engineering and mathematics incentive program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17Assemblysubstituted by s5773
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.550
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-07Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-04-29Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S05773 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback