NY A07405 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s5533b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-21 - substituted by s5533b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the United States sailing association to those allowed to give boating safety courses.
Title
Adds the United States sailing association to those allowed to give boating safety courses.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s5533b |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.650 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | print number 7405b |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | print number 7405a |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05533 (Same As) 2017-10-23 - SIGNED CHAP.386