NY A07405 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - signed chap.159
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - signed chap.159
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends for one year certain exemptions from professional licensure requirements for persons employed as mental health practitioners, psychologists and social workers in a program or service operated, regulated, funded, or approved by the department of mental hygiene, the office of children and family services, or a local governmental unit or social services district.
Title
Extends for one year certain exemptions from professional licensure requirements for persons employed as mental health practitioners, psychologists and social workers in a program or service operated, regulated, funded, or approved by the department of mental hygiene, the office of children and family services, or a local governmental unit or social services district.
Sponsors
Asm. Harry Bronson [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] | Asm. Pamela Hunter [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] |
Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | signed chap.159 |
2021-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2021-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1698 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6431 |
2021-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.242 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.242 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | print number 7405a |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to higher education |
2021-05-07 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06431 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7405A