NY A07455 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - print number 7455a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - print number 7455a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes retired firefighters to be employed as fire science instructors by career and technical education centers without a reduction of their retirement benefits.
Title
Authorizes retired firefighters to be employed as fire science instructors by career and technical education centers without a reduction of their retirement benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | Assembly | print number 7455a |
2024-01-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06155 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - PRINT NUMBER 6155A