NY A07456 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the flood mitigation and prevention task force to evaluate ways of protecting communities and residents of the state from flooding.
Title
Establishes the flood mitigation and prevention task force to evaluate ways of protecting communities and residents of the state from flooding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-20 | Senate | vetoed memo.251 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1758 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2682 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.282 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.282 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | print number 7456a |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2019-05-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S02682 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - tabled