NY A07506 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - advanced to third reading cal.762
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-22Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.762
2014-05-19Assemblyreported
2014-05-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2013-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.465
2013-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.465
2013-06-18Assemblyreported
2013-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2013-06-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2013-05-22Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S05643 (Same As) 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5643A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback