NY S05643 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5643A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5643A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Title
Relates to the cost effectiveness of consultant contracts by state agencies; defines "consultant services".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5643A |
2014-02-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A07506 (Same As) 2014-05-22 - advanced to third reading cal.762
A09698 (Same As) 2014-05-16 - referred to governmental operations
A09698 (Same As) 2014-05-16 - referred to governmental operations