NY A07569 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.296
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.296
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the payment of prevailing wages of affected employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant; requires the department of labor to oversee sale and the hiring of new employees at such power plant.
Title
Requires the payment of prevailing wages of affected employees of the Indian Point Nuclear Power Plant; requires the department of labor to oversee sale and the hiring of new employees at such power plant.
Sponsors
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Jonathan Jacobson [D] | Asm. Kevin Byrne [R] |
Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Assembly | POCKET VETO - VETO.296 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.652 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7569b |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1746 |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6567 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.652 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7569b |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | print number 7569a |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06567 (Same As) 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.296