NY A07592 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.167
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Chester to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Title
Authorizes the town of Chester to establish community preservation funds; establishes a real estate transfer tax with revenues therefrom to be deposited in said community preservation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.167 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.553 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7592 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to local governments |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1394 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5640B |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5640A |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5640b |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.553 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.553 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | amend by restoring to original print 7592 |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | print number 7592a |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05640 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - VETOED MEMO.167