NY A07620 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.431
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on October 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.431
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city police pension fund to receive a membership date in such pension fund attributable to service in the titles of police cadet program or police cadet program II.
Title
Relates to allowing certain members of the New York city police pension fund to receive a membership date in such pension fund attributable to service in the titles of police cadet program or police cadet program II.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.431 |
2019-10-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | home rule request |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.653 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a7620a |
2019-06-19 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1699 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 5903A |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5903a |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.653 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | print number 7620a |
2019-06-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental employees |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05903 (Same As) 2019-10-29 - SIGNED CHAP.431