NY A07640 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to claims against insurers for petroleum spills.
Title
Relates to claims against insurers for petroleum spills.
Sponsors
Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] | Asm. Robert Castelli [R] |
Sen. George Latimer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2011-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-05-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S06344 (Same As) 2012-01-30 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION