NY A07642 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.752
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.752
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Niskayuna, in the county of Schenectady, to offer certain retirement options to John F. Connor, Jeffrey A. Relation, Joseph H. Twitty and Paul J. Daly, police officers employed by such town.
Title
Authorizes the town of Niskayuna, in the county of Schenectady, to offer certain retirement options to John F. Connor, Jeffrey A. Relation, Joseph H. Twitty and Paul J. Daly, police officers employed by such town.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | signed chap.752 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1365 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7238A |
2022-05-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.311 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.311 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-01 | Assembly | print number 7642a |
2022-04-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | home rule request |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.777 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.777 |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07238 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7642A