NY A07654 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the office of court administration to pay certain judicial compensation to certain supreme court and appellate division justices for the period January 1, 2021 to June 14, 2021.
Title
Authorizes the office of court administration to pay certain judicial compensation to certain supreme court and appellate division justices for the period January 1, 2021 to June 14, 2021.
Sponsors
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Edward Braunstein [D] | Asm. Catalina Cruz [D] | Asm. Alex Bores [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted by s7496 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.784 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.784 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07496 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.185