NY A07667 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - substituted by s3204
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the 400 Years of African-American History Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the 400 Years of African-American History Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19Assemblysubstituted by s3204
2019-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.512
2019-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.512
2019-06-18Assemblyreported
2019-06-17Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-14Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-05-14Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S03204 (Same As) 2019-06-19 - returned to senate

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback