NY A07689 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-31 - signed chap.236
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes sanctions for credit card charge backs on motor vehicle fees.
Title
Imposes sanctions for credit card charge backs on motor vehicle fees.
Sponsors
Asm. David Gantt [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-31 | Senate | signed chap.236 |
2013-07-19 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2013-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1516 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5826 |
2013-06-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.604 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.604 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | print number 7689a |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04245 (Same As) 2013-05-29 - referred to transportation
S05826 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7689A
S05826 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7689A