NY S04245 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-29 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-29 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes sanctions for credit card charge backs on motor vehicle fees.
Title
Imposes sanctions for credit card charge backs on motor vehicle fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2013-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.342 |
2013-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07689 (Same As) 2013-07-31 - signed chap.236