NY A07696 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.158
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Nichols, county of Tioga, on state route seventeen between exits sixty-three and sixty-two as the "Dennis 'Matt' Howe Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Nichols, county of Tioga, on state route seventeen between exits sixty-three and sixty-two as the "Dennis 'Matt' Howe Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.158 |
2019-08-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.290 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a7696a |
2019-06-14 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1384 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 4915A |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s4915a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.290 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.290 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | print number 7696a |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04915 (Same As) 2019-08-09 - SIGNED CHAP.158