NY A07703 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a close friend to make an anatomical gift of a decedent's body.
Title
Permits a close friend to make an anatomical gift of a decedent's body.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] |
Asm. Yudelka Tapia [D] | Asm. Karines Reyes [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.351 |
2024-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06690 (Same As) 2024-04-19 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING