NY S06690 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits a close friend to make an anatomical gift of a decedent's body.
Title
Permits a close friend to make an anatomical gift of a decedent's body.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.834 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1055 |
2023-05-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07703 (Same As) 2024-03-11 - REFERRED TO HEALTH