NY A07714 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.450
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.450
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the provision of off-site health care services; directs the commissioner of health to allow diagnostic and treatment centers and outpatient clinics of general hospitals to provide off-site services to existing patients who are chronically ill and temporarily or permanently homebound at their residence or at a long term care facility.
Title
Relates to the provision of off-site health care services; directs the commissioner of health to allow diagnostic and treatment centers and outpatient clinics of general hospitals to provide off-site services to existing patients who are chronically ill and temporarily or permanently homebound at their residence or at a long term care facility.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.450 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1852 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8081 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7714c |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-08 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.310 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.171 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.171 |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | print number 7714b |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to rules |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 7714a |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-05-26 | Assembly | referred to health |