NY A07736 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - signed chap.443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-17 - signed chap.443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows assessors of the town of Whitestown and village of New York Mills to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the New York Mills Historical Society for certain parcels of land in such town and village.
Title
Allows assessors of the town of Whitestown and village of New York Mills to accept an application for a real property tax exemption from the New York Mills Historical Society for certain parcels of land in such town and village.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.443 |
2011-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.893 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5434 |
2011-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.315 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.315 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2011-05-16 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05434 (Same As) 2011-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7736