NY A07737 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - print number 7737a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - print number 7737a
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires more specific data reporting by the chief administrator to include information relating to all courts in the unified court system, including town and village courts.
Title
Requires more specific data reporting by the chief administrator to include information relating to all courts in the unified court system, including town and village courts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Assembly | print number 7737a |
2024-03-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06210 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING