NY A07828 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "New York State American Freedmen Task Force on Reparations Remedies Act"; acknowledges New York state's role in the fundamental injustice and inhumanity of the institution of slavery; establishes the New York State American Freedmen Task Force on Reparations Remedies; examines all aspects of slavery, subsequent de jure and de facto racial, social and economic discrimination against American freedmen and the impact of these forces on living American freedmen and to make determinations regarding compensation and repair; establishes a New York state freedmen's bureau charged with the distribution of reparations and reparative justice passed in legislation by the state; makes an appropriation therefor.
Title
Enacts the "New York State American Freedmen Task Force on Reparations Remedies Act"; acknowledges New York state's role in the fundamental injustice and inhumanity of the institution of slavery; establishes the New York State American Freedmen Task Force on Reparations Remedies; examines all aspects of slavery, subsequent de jure and de facto racial, social and economic discrimination against American freedmen and the impact of these forces on living American freedmen and to make determinations regarding compensation and repair; establishes a New York state freedmen's bureau charged with the distribution of reparations and reparative justice passed in legislation by the state; makes an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Asm. Nikki Lucas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | print number 7828b |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | print number 7828a |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2023-06-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |